|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/12/1923 | 09/02/1924 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6364 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1925 | 12/12/1925 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1927 | 28/01/1928 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1930 | 29/03/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1932 | 23/04/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1889 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/05/1934 | 16/06/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1936 | 25/07/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1034 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1939 | 25/03/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/01/1940 | 10/02/1940 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1941 | 26/04/1941 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3679 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1942 | 25/04/1942 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 06/11/1943 | 20/11/1943 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1946 | 23/03/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3678 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1948 | 02/10/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3656 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63655 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1951 | 24/11/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22325 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1951 | 08/12/1951 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1954 | 03/04/1954 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1954 | 05/04/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | Boiler number 22316 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/12/1956 | 19/01/1957 | 50 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28926 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1957 | 24/01/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1958 | 06/09/1958 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1960 | 04/06/1960 | 40 days | Light Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1616 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5202 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
22/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 09/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6364 |
||
09/02/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
15/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
03/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1925. Dep: 12/12/1925. | ||
17/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1927. Dep: 28/01/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1930. Dep: 29/03/1930. | ||
17/04/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
09/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1889 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1934. Dep: 16/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/05/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
02/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
11/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 25/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1034 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 10/02/1940. | ||
29/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1941. Dep: 26/04/1941. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3679 (Diagram 15D) |
||
22/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
03/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1942. Dep: 25/04/1942. | ||
29/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
06/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3677 (Diagram 15D) |
||
10/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
02/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3678 (Diagram 15D) |
||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
16/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3655 | ||
04/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1948. Dep: 02/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3656 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63655 |
||
03/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1951. Dep: 24/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22325 (Diagram 15D) |
||
27/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1951. Dep: 08/12/1951. | ||
13/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1954. Dep: 03/04/1954. | ||
03/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/04/1954. Dep: 05/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22316 (Diagram 15D) |
||
30/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
01/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1956. Dep: 19/01/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28926 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/01/1957. Dep: 24/01/1957. | ||
04/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/08/1958. Dep: 06/09/1958. | ||
26/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 26/04/1960. Dep: 04/06/1960. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63655 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |