|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/12/1928 | 30/03/1929 | 106 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6549 |
||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1931 | 28/08/1931 | 60 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1934 | 03/03/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1935 | 19/10/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1938 | 14/01/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1941 | 30/08/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1665 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3709 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
15/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1928. Dep: 30/03/1929. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6549 |
||
30/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
30/03/1929 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
06/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
07/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
30/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1931. Dep: 28/08/1931. | ||
17/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1934. Dep: 03/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1935. Dep: 19/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
24/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1938. Dep: 14/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
16/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1941. Dep: 30/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 700 from West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
20/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 700 |