|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/02/1924 | 19/08/1924 | 181 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6351 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/02/1926 | 11/06/1926 | 109 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/01/1928 | 27/03/1928 | 65 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/03/1930 | 01/05/1930 | 51 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1932 | 01/12/1932 | 50 days | General | New chimney and snifting valve fitted Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1935 | 27/04/1935 | 37 days | General | Boiler number C1475 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1935 | 19/09/1935 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 26/05/1937 | 19/06/1937 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1937 | 26/11/1937 | 30 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1939 | 01/07/1939 | 53 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/01/1941 | 25/01/1941 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1943 | 10/04/1943 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1945 | 09/06/1945 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 3262 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/09/1946 | 23/11/1946 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1948 | 23/04/1948 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63674 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1949 | 30/07/1949 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3409 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1951 | 05/05/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 22181 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1952 | 28/06/1952 | 47 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1953 | 07/11/1953 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 22184 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1955 | 05/11/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 22278 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1957 | 11/05/1957 | 55 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28931 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1959 | 03/07/1959 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1961 | 11/03/1961 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28802 (Diagram 15) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/01/1966 | Colwick MPD | Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. | SLS/196603 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1655 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3699 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2958 | ||
21/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1924. Dep: 19/08/1924. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6351 |
||
19/08/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stirling (29B) | ||
19/08/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
23/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1926. Dep: 11/06/1926. | ||
23/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1928. Dep: 27/03/1928. | ||
12/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1930. Dep: 01/05/1930. | ||
13/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1932. Dep: 01/12/1932. Work undertaken: New chimney and snifting valve fitted Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1935. Dep: 27/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1475 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/09/1935. Dep: 19/09/1935. | ||
26/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1937. Dep: 19/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1937. Dep: 26/11/1937. | ||
10/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1939. Dep: 01/07/1939. | ||
01/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1941. Dep: 25/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3228 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
26/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3262 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3674 | ||
11/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
09/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1948. Dep: 23/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63674 |
||
15/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1949. Dep: 30/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3409 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
24/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
06/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1951. Dep: 05/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22181 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/05/1952. Dep: 28/06/1952. | ||
28/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
01/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
26/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
16/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1953. Dep: 07/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22184 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
06/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1955. Dep: 05/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22278 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
18/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1957. Dep: 11/05/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28931 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 12/06/1959. Dep: 03/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1961. Dep: 11/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28802 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/01/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63674 from Colwick (16B) |