|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/05/1924 | 14/06/1924 | 30 days | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6354 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1927 | 27/08/1927 | 185 days | General | Boiler number 1496 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1929 | 26/11/1929 | 46 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1931 | 29/08/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1338 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1933 | 08/12/1933 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1935 | 28/12/1935 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1003 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1937 | 18/12/1937 | 19 days | General | Chimney altered Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1940 | 13/04/1940 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 17/06/1942 | 19/08/1942 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1944 | 30/12/1944 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1947 | 27/09/1947 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1950 | 05/08/1950 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63672 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1953 | 28/03/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 22125 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1953 | 03/04/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1957 | 13/04/1957 | 48 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28388 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/04/1957 | 02/05/1957 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1960 | 24/09/1960 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1653 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3697 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2905 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
16/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/05/1924. Dep: 14/06/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6354 |
||
12/06/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/06/1924 | To Stock | To LNWR stock | ||
24/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1927. Dep: 27/08/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1496 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 26/11/1929. | ||
08/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1338 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1933. Dep: 08/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/12/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
10/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
18/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1935. Dep: 28/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1003 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1937. Dep: 18/12/1937. Work undertaken: Chimney altered Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1940. Dep: 13/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3392 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1942. Dep: 19/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1944. Dep: 30/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3386 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
03/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3672 | ||
10/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1947. Dep: 27/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1950. Dep: 05/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3318 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63672 |
||
27/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1953. Dep: 28/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22125 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1953. Dep: 03/04/1953. | ||
25/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1957. Dep: 13/04/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28388 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/04/1957. Dep: 02/05/1957. | ||
22/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/08/1960. Dep: 24/09/1960. | ||
10/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
05/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63672 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |