|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/03/1927 | 21/05/1927 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6566 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1929 | 13/07/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1931 | 20/06/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1808 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1933 | 29/07/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1234 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1935 | 23/11/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1038 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1937 | 24/12/1937 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 1089 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1940 | 13/07/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1943 | 20/03/1943 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1945 | 04/08/1945 | 92 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1947 | 01/11/1947 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 5037 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1948 | 03/04/1948 | 10 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63740 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1948 | 26/06/1948 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1949 | 12/02/1949 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1949 | 23/04/1949 | 33 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1949 | 10/12/1949 | 33 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1951 | 03/03/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28295 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1953 | 14/02/1953 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28839 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1953 | 12/09/1953 | 24 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28274 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1955 | 21/04/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28840 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1957 | 16/03/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28386 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1959 | 23/10/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28984 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1962 | 16/08/1962 | 52 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1812 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21779 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
05/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1927. Dep: 21/05/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6566 |
||
19/05/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/05/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
01/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1929. Dep: 13/07/1929. | ||
06/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1808 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: 29/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1234 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1935. Dep: 23/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1038 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1937. Dep: 24/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1089 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
29/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
05/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
05/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
05/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/03/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
17/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3740 | ||
01/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1947. Dep: 01/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5037 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/03/1948. Dep: 03/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63740 |
||
10/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/06/1948. Dep: 26/06/1948. | ||
02/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/02/1949. Dep: 12/02/1949. | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
22/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949. | ||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
08/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/11/1949. Dep: 10/12/1949. | ||
05/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
25/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1951. Dep: 03/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28295 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
23/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1953. Dep: 14/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28839 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/08/1953. Dep: 12/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28274 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1955. Dep: 21/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28840 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1957. Dep: 16/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28386 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1959. Dep: 23/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28984 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/06/1962. Dep: 16/08/1962. | ||
17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63740 from Annesley (16D) |