|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 18/10/1919 | 29/11/1919 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1511 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1922 | 17/06/1922 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1477 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1924 | 15/11/1924 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 145 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6244 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1926 | 18/12/1926 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1928 | 15/09/1928 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1930 | 29/11/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1946 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1932 | 07/01/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1165 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1935 | 23/03/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1178 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/04/1937 | 01/05/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1359 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1939 | 05/08/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1941 | 06/12/1941 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 3247 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1942 | 09/01/1943 | 22 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1943 | 15/04/1944 | 121 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 9430 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1945 | 21/03/1945 | 9 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 48 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1948 | 07/07/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 5033 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63591 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1950 | 12/10/1950 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1950 | 02/11/1950 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1952 | 29/02/1952 | 49 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1952 | 29/11/1952 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 28386 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1954 | 02/10/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28829 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1955 | 08/10/1955 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1956 | 22/11/1956 | 6 days | General | Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1958 | 22/02/1958 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1959 | 07/08/1959 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28268 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1962 | 10/05/1962 | 44 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1244 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19900 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
18/10/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1919. Dep: 29/11/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1511 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/02/1920 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
29/04/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1922. Dep: 17/06/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1477 (Diagram 15) Ross Pop |
||
30/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1924. Dep: 15/11/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 145 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6244 |
||
16/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1926. Dep: 18/12/1926. | ||
28/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1928. Dep: 15/09/1928. | ||
08/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1930. Dep: 29/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1946 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/12/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
14/12/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
17/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1932. Dep: 07/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1165 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
02/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1935. Dep: 23/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1178 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1937. Dep: 01/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1359 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1939. Dep: 05/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1954 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
21/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1941. Dep: 06/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3247 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
07/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1943. Dep: 15/04/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 9430 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
13/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1945. Dep: 21/03/1945. | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
08/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. | ||
22/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3591 | ||
07/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1948. Dep: 07/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5033 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63591 |
||
04/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1950. Dep: 12/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28265 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/10/1950. Dep: 02/11/1950. | ||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
12/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/01/1952. Dep: 29/02/1952. | ||
10/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1952. Dep: 29/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28386 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1954. Dep: 02/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28829 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/08/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955. | ||
17/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1956. Dep: 22/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/01/1958. Dep: 22/02/1958. | ||
25/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1959. Dep: 07/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28268 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/03/1962. Dep: 10/05/1962. | ||
17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63591 from Annesley (16D) |