|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/03/1918 | 03/08/1918 | 141 days | General | Boiler number 1442 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1921 | 12/03/1921 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1923 | 16/02/1924 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6231 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1926 | 19/03/1927 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1929 | 31/08/1929 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1489 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1931 | 24/10/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1172 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1934 | 31/03/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/04/1936 | 02/05/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1938 | 02/04/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/07/1940 | 27/07/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1943 | 21/08/1943 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1945 | 13/10/1945 | 85 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5044 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 1946 | 02/1946 | Unclassified | Drop Grate fitted |
|||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1947 | 14/12/1947 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 5113 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/01/1950 | 28/01/1950 | 27 days | General | Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted Renumbered to BR 63578 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1950 | 02/02/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1951 | 09/06/1951 | 42 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1953 | 14/02/1953 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1954 | 27/02/1954 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1954 | 04/02/1955 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28387 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1956 | 17/03/1956 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1957 | 20/04/1957 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 28901 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1958 | 23/08/1958 | 16 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1961 | 11/03/1961 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
16/06/1963 | Derby Works (Stone Pit) | Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41531 cut up, 41535, 73001/32, 75012, D147, D2396, D2507, D2911, D3017/21/3/56/68, D3305, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay-D3, D46, D62, D5008, D5133/48; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay-D5215-21, D7568-73. Finishing Shop: D81, D116/9, D5010. Paint Shop: 75064, D5213/4. Diesel Erecting Shop: D34, D52, D75, D97, D112, D134/5, D141, D160, D5024/82. Test House: D109, D5012/4/32/86, D5138, D5213. Yard (by paint shop): 42178, D2, D4, D6, D7, D42/3, D72, D98, D114, D131, D149, D154, D3122, D5002/9/13, D5142, D5206/10/1, ED4. Stone Pit: 63578, D2503. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 44417, 47341, 47429, 47465, 73007, 75011/50, D90. Stored outside offices: 43593, 43645, 43754, 47417, 10000/201/2/3. | SLS/196307 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1231 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19887 Allocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
16/03/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1918. Dep: 03/08/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1442 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/02/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1921. Dep: 12/03/1921. | ||
24/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1923. Dep: 16/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6231 |
||
11/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1926. Dep: 19/03/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 31/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1489 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1931. Dep: 24/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1172 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1934. Dep: 31/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1936. Dep: 02/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1114 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1938. Dep: 02/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1940. Dep: 27/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
28/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
10/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
09/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5044 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/10/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/02/1946. Work undertaken: Drop Grate fitted |
||
27/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3578 | ||
08/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1947. Dep: 14/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5113 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1950. Dep: 28/01/1950. Work undertaken: Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted Renumbered to BR 63578 |
||
31/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/01/1950. Dep: 02/02/1950. | ||
16/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
29/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1951. Dep: 09/06/1951. | ||
23/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1953. Dep: 14/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1954. Dep: 27/02/1954. | ||
29/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1954. Dep: 04/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28387 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1956. Dep: 17/03/1956. | ||
22/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1957. Dep: 20/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28901 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1958. Dep: 23/08/1958. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
06/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/02/1961. Dep: 11/03/1961. | ||
17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63578 from Annesley (16D) |