|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/06/1917 | 28/07/1917 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1476 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1922 | 07/10/1922 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 768 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1925 | 21/02/1925 | 43 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6209 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1927 | 13/08/1927 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1929 | 24/09/1929 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1931 | 19/12/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1878 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1934 | 28/07/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/04/1937 | 01/05/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1940 | 01/06/1940 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1942 | 18/04/1942 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1944 | 22/07/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3674 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1946 | 05/10/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3696 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1949 | 26/02/1949 | 22 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63761 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1950 | 17/06/1950 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1951 | 23/06/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22319 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1953 | 10/10/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22307 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1954 | 11/09/1954 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1956 | 15/12/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22870 (Diagram 15D) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1209 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19865 Allocated to Mexborough (MEX) Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
02/06/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1917. Dep: 28/07/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1476 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/07/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1922. Dep: 07/10/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 768 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1925. Dep: 21/02/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6209 |
||
11/08/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
28/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1927. Dep: 13/08/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/01/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
20/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1929. Dep: 24/09/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1931. Dep: 19/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1878 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1934. Dep: 28/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1937. Dep: 01/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1940. Dep: 01/06/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D) |
||
24/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
02/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1942. Dep: 18/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D) |
||
06/08/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
07/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
24/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3674 (Diagram 15D) |
||
14/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1946. Dep: 05/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3696 (Diagram 15D) |
||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3556 | ||
12/03/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3761 | ||
29/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
05/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1949. Dep: 26/02/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63761 |
||
22/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
28/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
27/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/05/1950. Dep: 17/06/1950. | ||
08/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
09/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22319 (Diagram 15D) |
||
19/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1953. Dep: 10/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22307 (Diagram 15D) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
04/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/09/1954. Dep: 11/09/1954. | ||
17/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22870 (Diagram 15D) |
||
18/06/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63761 from Frodingham (36C) |