|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1922 | 21/09/1922 | 66 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1923 | 22/12/1923 | 135 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 460N |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1926 | 30/03/1926 | 86 days | General | Boiler number 7513 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3460 |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1927 | 19/01/1928 | 69 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1930 | 03/05/1930 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 7523 (Diagram 2) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1932 | 22/04/1932 | 66 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1932 | 23/09/1932 | 46 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 04/01/1933 | 16/02/1933 | 44 days | 1 | |||
Gorton Works | 13/09/1934 | 27/10/1934 | 45 days | General | Boiler number G982 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1936 | 28/11/1936 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 8461 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/06/1938 | 21/07/1938 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1938 | 20/09/1938 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1940 | 27/04/1940 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1943 | 16/05/1943 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1945 | 25/05/1945 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 4404 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1947 | 01/08/1947 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1947 | 11/08/1947 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1948 | 27/02/1948 | 16 days | Heavy | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3479 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/09/1948 | 08/10/1948 | 30 days | Heavy | Renumbered to BR 63479 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1949 | 21/09/1949 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9246 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1949 | 05/10/1949 | 5 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 460 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1418 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
18/07/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/07/1922. Dep: 21/09/1922. | ||
10/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 460N |
||
04/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1926. Dep: 30/03/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7513 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3460 |
||
12/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 19/01/1928. | ||
03/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1930. Dep: 03/05/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7523 (Diagram 2) |
||
23/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY) | ||
01/10/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
17/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1932. Dep: 22/04/1932. | ||
09/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/08/1932. Dep: 23/09/1932. | ||
04/01/1933 | Works Visit | |||
13/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1934. Dep: 27/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number G982 (Diagram 2) |
||
19/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1936. Dep: 28/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8461 (Diagram 2) |
||
17/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1938. Dep: 21/07/1938. | ||
22/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/08/1938. Dep: 20/09/1938. | ||
18/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940. | ||
20/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
15/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1943. Dep: 16/05/1943. | ||
12/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
30/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
06/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1945. Dep: 25/05/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4404 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
11/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3479 | ||
18/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1947. Dep: 01/08/1947. | ||
07/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1947. Dep: 11/08/1947. | ||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
12/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/02/1948. Dep: 27/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3479 |
||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
09/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/09/1948. Dep: 08/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63479 |
||
10/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1949. Dep: 21/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9246 (Diagram 2) |
||
01/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1949. Dep: 05/10/1949. | ||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
18/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
05/1951 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
16/05/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63479 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |