|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 09/02/1933 | 24/03/1933 | 44 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1934 | 04/08/1934 | 62 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1936 | 10/07/1936 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 8459 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1937 | 02/10/1937 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 9012 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1939 | 13/05/1939 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1940 | 01/01/1941 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1942 | 28/03/1942 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1942 | 16/01/1943 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9364 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1947 | 22/05/1947 | 83 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1949 | 26/05/1949 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 9318 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63949 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1951 | 23/04/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 21020 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1953 | 13/07/1953 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 21068 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1955 | 31/08/1955 | 36 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28199 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1958 | 06/08/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28129 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1961 | 15/04/1961 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28819 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/05/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2956 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1775 Allocated to March (MAR) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
09/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/02/1933. Dep: 24/03/1933. | ||
04/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1934. Dep: 04/08/1934. | ||
10/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1936. Dep: 10/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8459 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9012 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939. | ||
23/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1940. Dep: 01/01/1941. | ||
07/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/02/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942. | ||
19/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1942. Dep: 16/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9364 (Diagram 2) |
||
11/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. | ||
17/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3949 | ||
01/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1947. Dep: 22/05/1947. | ||
03/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1949. Dep: 26/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9318 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63949 |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
23/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1951. Dep: 23/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21020 (Diagram 2) |
||
16/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
28/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
03/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
17/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
19/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1953. Dep: 13/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21068 (Diagram 2) |
||
27/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1955. Dep: 31/08/1955. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 Boiler number 28199 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1958. Dep: 06/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28129 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1961. Dep: 15/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28819 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
08/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63949 from Grantham (34F) | ||
10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |