Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 112 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5456 Week
» 6346 Month
» 314327 Year
» 1198708 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 9227 m/e 04/1924
LNER (1946) 9224 m/e 05/1946
BR 69224 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 04/1924
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/10/1962 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 02/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 38 yrs, 6 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
THJ Thornton Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 8w/e 31/08/1957
61C Keith 4w/e 12/04/1958
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 11/04/1959
64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/07/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 11/04/1959
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 9227
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9224    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69224    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69224 from St Margarets (64A)    
02/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev