Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 597 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5554 Week
» 12738 Month
» 320719 Year
» 1205100 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 9147 m/e 03/1924
LNER (1946) 9221 m/e 11/1946
BR 69221 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1924
Withdrawal Wed 19/07/1961 off Dunfermline Upper (62C)
Scrapping During 08/1961 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 37 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DFU Dunfermline Upper 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 19/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   19/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 9147
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9221    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69221    
07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69221 from Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
08/1961 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev