Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 988 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 988 Week
» 7122 Month
» 235006 Year
» 1456571 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 99 m/e 02/1924
LNER (1924) 9099 m/e 03/1926
LNER (1946) 9219 on 03/03/1946
BR 69219 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 02/1924
Withdrawal Tue 05/12/1961 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 37 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1924
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 05/12/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   05/12/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1950 Cowlairs Works Engines due into Works, July 1950: 61754/71, 1931, 61983, 62208, 62424, 4549/61, 67605/67, 68324, 8450, 69187, 69219, 77230, 90262, 90498. SLS/195010

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1924 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 99
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
03/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9099    
03/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9219    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69219    
05/12/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69219 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev prev