Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 139 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 1268 Week
» 15525 Month
» 243409 Year
» 1464974 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 79 m/e 02/1924
LNER (1924) 9079 m/e 06/1926
LNER (1946) 9218 m/e 06/1946
BR 69218 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 02/1924
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/10/1962 off Eastfield (65A)
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 38 yrs, 8 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1924
CAR Carlisle Canal 01/01/1948
65A Eastfield 8w/e 09/09/1951
65D Dawsholm 4w/e 26/08/1961
65A Eastfield 4w/e 18/11/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 26/08/1961
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 2w/e 04/11/1961
WDN   w/e 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/08/1962 Polmont MPD In store on 2nd August-40188/9/200, 64795, 67618/29/30/43/62/78, 69188/212/8. 65280 an 69137 were removed during July to Inverurie for scrap. 69126 an 68454/72 were en route Boness dump-Clarkston for scrap on 31st July. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1924 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 79
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
06/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9079    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9218    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69218    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
26/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
18/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69218 from Eastfield (65A)    

prev prev