Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 173 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 1302 Week
» 15559 Month
» 243443 Year
» 1465008 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 77 m/e 12/1923
LNER (1924) 9077 m/e 07/1926
LNER (1946) 9216 m/e 04/1946
BR 69216 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1923
Withdrawal w/e Mon 12/02/1962 off Bathgate (64F)
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 38 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1923
BGT Bathgate 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 12/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   w/e 12/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/09/1947 Eastfield MPD Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. SLS/194711
31/10/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. SLS/194912

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1923 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 77
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
07/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9077    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9216    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bathgate (BGT)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69216    
12/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69216 from Bathgate (64F)    

prev prev