|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. | SLS/195008 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1923 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 75 Built at Cowlairs Works |
||
08/1926 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9075 | ||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9214 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) | ||
01/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69214 | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
19/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
07/05/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69214 from Eastfield (65A) | ||
09/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |