Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 175 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3194 Week
» 10378 Month
» 318359 Year
» 1202740 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 75 m/e 12/1923
LNER (1924) 9075 m/e 08/1926
LNER (1946) 9214 m/e 06/1946
BR 69214 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1923
Withdrawal Thu 07/05/1959 off Eastfield (65A)
Scrapping During 09/1959 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 35 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PKD Parkhead 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65A Eastfield 8w/e 19/04/1952
   Withdrawn 07/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 22/03/1952
WDN   07/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1923 To Service To service as NBR Number 75
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
08/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9075    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9214    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69214    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69214 from Eastfield (65A)    
09/1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev