Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 964 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 964 Week
» 7098 Month
» 234982 Year
» 1456547 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 75 m/e 12/1923
LNER (1924) 9075 m/e 08/1926
LNER (1946) 9214 m/e 06/1946
BR 69214 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1923
Withdrawal Thu 07/05/1959 off Eastfield (65A)
Scrapping During 09/1959 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 35 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1923
PKD Parkhead 01/01/1948
65A Eastfield 8w/e 19/04/1952
   Withdrawn 07/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 22/03/1952
WDN   07/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
24/08/1947 Cowlairs Works On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. SLS/194710
07/09/1947 Eastfield MPD Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. SLS/194711
31/01/1950 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. SLS/195003
30/06/1950 Cowlairs Works Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1923 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 75
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
08/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9075    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9214    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69214    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
07/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69214 from Eastfield (65A)    

prev prev