Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 100 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1227 Week
» 12520 Month
» 277153 Year
» 1498718 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 67 m/e 12/1923
LNER (1924) 9067 m/e 04/1926
LNER (1946) 9212 m/e 06/1946
BR 69212 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1923
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/10/1962 off Eastfield (65A)
Scrapping During 10/1962 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 38 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1923
PKD Parkhead on 01/01/1948
65A Eastfield 4w/e 06/07/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   w/e 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/08/1962 Polmont MPD In store on 2nd August-40188/9/200, 64795, 67618/29/30/43/62/78, 69188/212/8. 65280 an 69137 were removed during July to Inverurie for scrap. 69126 an 68454/72 were en route Boness dump-Clarkston for scrap on 31st July. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1923 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 67
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
04/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9067    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9212    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69212    
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69212 from Eastfield (65A)    

prev prev