Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 115 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5459 Week
» 6349 Month
» 314330 Year
» 1198711 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 67 m/e 12/1923
LNER (1924) 9067 m/e 04/1926
LNER (1946) 9212 m/e 06/1946
BR 69212 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1923
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/10/1962 off Eastfield (65A)
Scrapping During 10/1962 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 38 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PKD Parkhead 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65A Eastfield 4w/e 06/07/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   w/e 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1923 To Service To service as NBR Number 67
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
04/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9067    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9212    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69212    
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
10/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69212 from Eastfield (65A)    

prev prev