Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 157 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 1286 Week
» 15543 Month
» 243427 Year
» 1464992 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 60 m/e 11/1923
LNER (1924) 9060 m/e 03/1926
LNER (1946) 9211 on 24/03/1946
BR 69211 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 11/1923
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/10/1962 off Haymarket (64B)
Scrapping During 06/1964 at P.W. McLellan (Coatbridge)
Service Life 38 yrs, 11 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1923
THJ Thornton Junction 01/01/1948
64B Haymarket 4w/e 14/03/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 64B Haymarket 4w/e 14/03/1959
WDN   w/e 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/05/1962 Bathgate MPD Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. SLS/196206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1923 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 60
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
03/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9060    
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9211    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69211    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69211 from Haymarket (64B)    

prev prev