Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 590 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5547 Week
» 12731 Month
» 320712 Year
» 1205093 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 71 m/e 12/1923
LNER (1924) 9071 m/e 12/1926
LNER (1946) 9178 m/e 05/1946
BR 69178 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Cowlairs Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 12/1923
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Motherwell (66B)
Scrapping During 10/1963 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 39 yrs , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66A Polmadie 4w/e 01/07/1961
66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 26/08/1961
66B Motherwell 4w/e 22/12/1962
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 26/08/1961
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 7w/e 29/12/1962
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1923 To Service To service as NBR Number 71
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
12/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9071    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9178    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69178    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
26/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
22/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69178 from Motherwell (66B)    
10/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev