Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 190 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3209 Week
» 10393 Month
» 318374 Year
» 1202755 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 528 m/e 03/1923
LNER (1924) 9528 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 9205 m/e 11/1946
BR 69205 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E117
Works Number 3860
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1923
Withdrawal Thu 18/02/1960 off Dawsholm (65D)
Scrapping During 04/1960 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 36 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65D Dawsholm 4w/e 25/11/1950
   Withdrawn 18/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm m/e 30/11/1950
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   18/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1923 To Service To service as NBR Number 528
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3860
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9528    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9205    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69205    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69205 from Dawsholm (65D)    
04/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev