Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 228 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3247 Week
» 10431 Month
» 318412 Year
» 1202793 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 527 m/e 03/1923
LNER (1924) 9527 m/e 08/1925
LNER (1946) 9204 m/e 01/1947
BR 69204 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E117
Works Number 3859
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1923
Withdrawal w/e Mon 16/07/1962 off Thornton Junction (62A)
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 39 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DFU Dunfermline Upper 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 8w/e 31/08/1957
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 19/12/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 16/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 19/12/1959
WDN   w/e 16/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1923 To Service To service as NBR Number 527
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3859
   
08/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9527    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 9204    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69204    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
19/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
16/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69204 from Thornton Junction (62A)    
11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev