Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 1042 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 1042 Week
» 7176 Month
» 235060 Year
» 1456625 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 526 m/e 03/1923
LNER (1924) 9526 m/e 02/1926
LNER (1946) 9203 m/e 12/1946
BR 69203 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E117
Works Number 3858
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1923
Withdrawal Thu 26/06/1958 off Dawsholm (65D)
Scrapping During 06/1960 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 35 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1923
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948
65D Dawsholm 4w/e 25/11/1950
   Withdrawn 26/06/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm m/e 30/11/1950
WDN   26/06/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1953 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1950 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. SLS/195004

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1923 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 526
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3858
   
02/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9526    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9203    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69203    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
12/1953 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
26/06/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69203 from Dawsholm (65D)    

prev prev