Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 595 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5552 Week
» 12736 Month
» 320717 Year
» 1205098 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 524 m/e 03/1923
LNER (1924) 9524 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 9201 m/e 01/1947
BR 69201 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E117
Works Number 3856
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1923
Withdrawal Fri 10/01/1958 off Keith (61C)
Scrapping During 03/1958 at Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock)
Service Life 34 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DFU Dunfermline Upper 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61C Keith 4w/e 21/12/1957
   Withdrawn 10/01/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 28/12/1957
WDN   10/01/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1923 To Service To service as NBR Number 524
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3856
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9524    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 9201    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69201    
21/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
01/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69201 from Keith (61C)    
03/1958 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Kilmarnock    

prev prev