Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1039 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 1039 Week
» 7173 Month
» 235057 Year
» 1456622 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 524 m/e 03/1923
LNER (1924) 9524 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 9201 m/e 01/1947
BR 69201 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E117
Works Number 3856
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1923
Withdrawal Fri 10/01/1958 off Keith (61C)
Scrapping During 03/1958 at Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock)
Service Life 34 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1923
DFU Dunfermline Upper 01/01/1948
61C Keith 4w/e 21/12/1957
   Withdrawn 10/01/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 28/12/1957
WDN   10/01/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/10/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. SLS/194911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1923 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 524
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3856
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9524    
01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 9201    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69201    
21/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
10/01/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69201 from Keith (61C)    

prev prev