Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 124 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 1253 Week
» 15510 Month
» 243394 Year
» 1464959 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 522 m/e 02/1923
LNER (1924) 9522 m/e 02/1925
LNER (1946) 9199 m/e 04/1946
BR 69199 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E117
Works Number 3854
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 02/1923
Withdrawal Thu 18/05/1961 off Parkhead (65C)
Scrapping During 09/1961 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 38 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1923
PKD Parkhead 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 18/05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   18/05/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. SLS/194912
30/11/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. SLS/195001

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1923 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 522
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3854
   
02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9522    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9199    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69199    
18/05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69199 from Parkhead (65C)    

prev prev