Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 378 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 5886 Week
» 26788 Month
» 26788 Year
» 1248353 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 520 m/e 01/1923
LNER (1924) 9520 m/e 08/1925
LNER (1946) 9197 m/e 05/1946
BR 69197 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E117
Works Number 3852
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 01/1923
Withdrawal Fri 18/12/1959 off Eastfield (65A)
Scrapping During 03/1960 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 36 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAR Carlisle Canal 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65A Eastfield 8w/e 09/09/1951
   Withdrawn 18/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 11/08/1951
WDN   18/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1923 To Service To service as NBR Number 520
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3852
   
08/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9520    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9197    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69197    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69197 from Eastfield (65A)    
03/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev