Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 218 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3237 Week
» 10421 Month
» 318402 Year
» 1202783 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 519 m/e 01/1923
LNER (1924) 9519 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 9196 m/e 04/1946
BR 69196 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E117
Works Number 3851
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 01/1923
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/10/1962 off Hamilton (West) (66C)
Scrapping During 10/1963 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 39 yrs, 9 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KPS Kipps 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 19/12/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 19/12/1959
WDN   w/e 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1923 To Service To service as NBR Number 519
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3851
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9519    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9196    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69196    
19/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69196 from Hamilton (West) (66C)    
10/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev