Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1037 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 1037 Week
» 7171 Month
» 235055 Year
» 1456620 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 97 m/e 02/1920
LNER (1924) 9097 m/e 05/1925
LNER (1946) 9191 on 03/02/1946
BR 69191 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L717
Works Number 22283
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 02/1920
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/10/1962 off Eastfield (65A)
Scrapping During 10/1962 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 42 yrs, 8 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1920
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1936 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/01/1962 Bo\'ness stored locos Locos stored at Bo'ness on 13th January were as follows: 40158/9/200, 44956/77, 57285/7/314/38/66, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7, 64514/5/8/32/5, 65230, 67611/9/22/5/6/32/55, 68448/54/72/9, 69014, 69131/81/91, 90436; also the following wdn. locos.-55222, 57245/57, 57411/29/70/2/557/76, 64461, 67650, 68119 an 69183. SLS/196202
03/06/1962 Stored at Boness Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. SLS/196207

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1920 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 97
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22283
   
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9097    
04/1936 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9191    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 69191    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69191 from Eastfield (65A)    

prev prev