Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 827 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3513 Week
» 4403 Month
» 312384 Year
» 1196765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 49 m/e 02/1920
LNER (1924) 9049 m/e 08/1925
LNER (1946) 9189 m/e 11/1946
BR 69189 w/e 25/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L717
Works Number 22281
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 02/1920
Withdrawal Fri 18/04/1958 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Scrapping During 06/1958 at Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock)
Service Life 38 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 06/07/1957
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 8w/e 31/08/1957
   Withdrawn 18/04/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 07/09/1957
WDN   18/04/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1948 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1920 To Service To service as NBR Number 49
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22281
   
08/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9049    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9189    
01/1948 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69189    
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
04/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69189 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
06/1958 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Kilmarnock    

prev prev