Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1060 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 1060 Week
» 7194 Month
» 235078 Year
» 1456643 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 29 m/e 02/1920
LNER (1924) 9029 m/e 09/1925
LNER (1946) 9188 m/e 06/1946
BR 69188 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N15/102/1920
N15/203/1929
N15/111/1953
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L717
Works Number 22280
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 02/1920
Withdrawal w/e Mon 01/10/1962 off Eastfield (65A)
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 42 yrs, 8 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1920
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 01/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 01/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1929 Westinghouse Brake fitted
03/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
11/1953 Vacuum Ejector fitted
11/1953 Steam Brake fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/08/1962 Polmont MPD In store on 2nd August-40188/9/200, 64795, 67618/29/30/43/62/78, 69188/212/8. 65280 an 69137 were removed during July to Inverurie for scrap. 69126 an 68454/72 were en route Boness dump-Clarkston for scrap on 31st July. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1920 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 29
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22280
   
09/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9029    
03/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/1929 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9188    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69188    
11/1953 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
11/1953 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
01/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69188 from Eastfield (65A)    

prev prev