Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 196 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3215 Week
» 10399 Month
» 318380 Year
» 1202761 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 259 m/e 03/1917
LNER (1924) 9259 m/e 07/1924
LNER (1946) 9184 m/e 06/1946
BR 69184 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L653
Works Number 21229
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 03/1917
Withdrawal Wed 23/11/1960 off Dawsholm (65D)
Scrapping During 01/1961 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 43 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65D Dawsholm 4w/e 25/11/1950
   Withdrawn 23/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm m/e 30/11/1950
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   23/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1917 To Service To service as NBR Number 259
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21229
   
07/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9259    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9184    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69184    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69184 from Dawsholm (65D)    
01/1961 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev