Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 130 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5474 Week
» 6364 Month
» 314345 Year
» 1198726 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 453 m/e 01/1917
LNER (1924) 9453 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 9180 m/e 09/1946
BR 69180 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L653
Works Number 21225
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 01/1917
Withdrawal Mon 20/03/1961 off Kittybrewster (61A)
Scrapping During 04/1961 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 44 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65B St Rollox (Balornock) 8w/e 31/08/1957
65A Eastfield 4w/e 05/07/1958
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 11/04/1959
   Withdrawn 20/03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 11/04/1959
WDN   20/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1953 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1917 To Service To service as NBR Number 453
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21225
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9453    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9180    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69180    
03/1953 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)    
05/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69180 from Kittybrewster (61A)    
04/1961 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev