Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 590 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5547 Week
» 12731 Month
» 320712 Year
» 1205093 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 69 m/e 10/1916
LNER (1924) 9069 m/e 03/1925
LNER (1946) 9176 m/e 08/1946
BR 69176 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L653
Works Number 21222
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 10/1916
Withdrawal Wed 12/08/1959 off Dawsholm (65D)
Scrapping During 09/1959 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 42 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65D Dawsholm 4w/e 25/11/1950
   Withdrawn 12/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm m/e 30/11/1950
WDN   12/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1916 To Service To service as NBR Number 69
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21222
   
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9069    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9176    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69176    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69176 from Dawsholm (65D)    
09/1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev