Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 100 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1227 Week
» 12520 Month
» 277153 Year
» 1498718 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 54 m/e 08/1916
LNER (1924) 9054 m/e 10/1924
LNER (1946) 9173 m/e 06/1946
BR 69173 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L653
Works Number 21219
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 08/1916
Withdrawal Thu 12/01/1961 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 03/1961 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 44 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1916
STM St Margarets on 01/01/1948
64B Haymarket 4w/e 14/05/1955
64A St Margarets 4w/e 06/08/1955
   Withdrawn on 12/01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 64B Haymarket 4w/e 14/05/1955
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 09/07/1955
WDN   on 12/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1947 Eastfield MPD Further locos. ex Cowlairs Works that have been noted here during November were: Nos. 1728/45, 1764/6 (green, with 1766 snowplough fitted), 2406/31/64/75, 4574, 4605/39, 4817, 4932, 5924, 7465, 8096, 8471, 8957, 9144/62/73. SLS/194801

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1916 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 54
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21219
   
10/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9054    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9173    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69173    
14/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
06/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
12/01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69173 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev prev