Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 590 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5547 Week
» 12731 Month
» 320712 Year
» 1205093 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 47 m/e 08/1916
LNER (1924) 9047 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 9172 m/e 07/1946
BR 69172 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L653
Works Number 21218
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 08/1916
Withdrawal Thu 13/11/1958 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 08/1959 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 42 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
STM St Margarets 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64A St Margarets 4w/e 06/08/1955
   Withdrawn 13/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   13/11/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 21/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1916 To Service To service as NBR Number 47
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21218
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9047    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9172    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM)    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 69172    
06/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69172 from St Margarets (64A)    
08/1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev