Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 109 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5453 Week
» 6343 Month
» 314324 Year
» 1198705 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 264 m/e 05/1913
LNER (1924) 9264 m/e 05/1924
LNER (1946) 9171 m/e 05/1946
BR 69171 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L528
Works Number 20172
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 05/1913
Withdrawal w/e Thu 16/06/1960 off Eastfield (65A)
Scrapping During 08/1960 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 47 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PKD Parkhead 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65A Eastfield 8w/e 19/04/1952
   Withdrawn w/e 16/06/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 22/03/1952
WDN   w/e 16/06/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1913 To Service To service as NBR Number 264
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 20172
   
05/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9264    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9171    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD)    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69171    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
06/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69171 from Eastfield (65A)    
08/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev