Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 103 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1230 Week
» 12523 Month
» 277156 Year
» 1498721 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 229 m/e 05/1913
LNER (1924) 9229 m/e 09/1925
LNER (1946) 9166 m/e 11/1946
BR 69166 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L528
Works Number 20167
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 05/1913
Withdrawal Mon 07/12/1959 off Parkhead (65C)
Scrapping During 01/1960 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 46 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1913
EFD Eastfield on 01/01/1948
65C Parkhead 4w/e 25/11/1950
   Withdrawn on 07/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65C Parkhead m/e 30/11/1950
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   on 07/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. SLS/194908

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1913 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 229
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 20167
   
09/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9229    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9166    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69166    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
07/12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69166 from Parkhead (65C)    

prev prev