Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 106 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5450 Week
» 6340 Month
» 314321 Year
» 1198702 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 229 m/e 05/1913
LNER (1924) 9229 m/e 09/1925
LNER (1946) 9166 m/e 11/1946
BR 69166 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L528
Works Number 20167
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 05/1913
Withdrawal Mon 07/12/1959 off Parkhead (65C)
Scrapping During 01/1960 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 46 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65C Parkhead 4w/e 25/11/1950
   Withdrawn 07/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65C Parkhead m/e 30/11/1950
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   07/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1913 To Service To service as NBR Number 229
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 20167
   
09/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9229    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9166    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69166    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69166 from Parkhead (65C)    
01/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev