Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 105 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5449 Week
» 6339 Month
» 314320 Year
» 1198701 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 224 m/e 05/1913
LNER (1924) 9224 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 9165 m/e 04/1946
BR 69165 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L528
Works Number 20166
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 05/1913
Withdrawal Thu 19/05/1960 off Parkhead (65C)
Scrapping During 06/1960 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 47 yrs , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65C Parkhead 4w/e 25/11/1950
   Withdrawn 19/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65C Parkhead m/e 30/11/1950
WDN   19/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1913 To Service To service as NBR Number 224
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 20166
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9224    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9165    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69165    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Parkhead (65C)    
05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69165 from Parkhead (65C)    
06/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev