Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 186 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3205 Week
» 10389 Month
» 318370 Year
» 1202751 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 223 m/e 05/1913
LNER (1924) 9223 m/e 09/1924
LNER (1946) 9164 m/e 11/1946
BR 69164 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L528
Works Number 20165
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 05/1913
Withdrawal Wed 15/04/1959 off Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
Scrapping During 02/1960 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 45 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DFU Dunfermline Upper 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 02/08/1958
   Withdrawn 15/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   15/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1953 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1913 To Service To service as NBR Number 223
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 20165
   
09/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9223    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9164    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69164    
11/1953 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
02/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69164 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
02/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev