Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1913 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15319 Week
» 68335 Month
» 187862 Year
» 3214715 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
223 |
m/e |
05/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9223 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9164 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69164 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/04/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1953 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1913 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 223 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 20165 |
|
|
09/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9223 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9164 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69164 |
|
|
11/1953 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
02/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
15/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69164 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|