Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 139 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17942 Week
» 70958 Month
» 190485 Year
» 3217338 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
219 |
m/e |
05/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9219 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9185 |
on |
24/02/1946 |
British Railways |
69185 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65A |
Eastfield |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/07/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1913 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 219 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 20164 |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9219 |
|
|
24/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9185 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69185 |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
09/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
27/07/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69185 from St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Kilmarnock |
|
|