Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 294 Today
» 986 Yesterday
» 5802 Week
» 26704 Month
» 26704 Year
» 1248269 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 219 m/e 05/1913
LNER (1924) 9219 m/e 12/1924
LNER (1946) 9185 m/e 24/02/1946
BR 69185 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L528
Works Number 20164
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 05/1913
Withdrawal Mon 27/07/1959 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 09/1959 at Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock)
Service Life 46 yrs, 2 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAR Carlisle Canal 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65A Eastfield 8w/e 09/09/1951
64A St Margarets 4w/e 29/12/1951
   Withdrawn 27/07/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 29/12/1951
WDN   27/07/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1913 To Service To service as NBR Number 219
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 20164
   
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9219    
02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9185    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69185    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
07/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69185 from St Margarets (64A)    
09/1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Kilmarnock    

prev prev