Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3559 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16965 Week
» 69981 Month
» 189508 Year
» 3216361 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
926 |
m/e |
08/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9926 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9163 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
69163 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1954 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/06/1962 |
Stored at Boness |
Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. |
SLS/196207 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1912 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 926 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19847 |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9926 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9163 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69163 |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
05/1954 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
06/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
12/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69163 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
07/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|