Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 825 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3511 Week
» 4401 Month
» 312382 Year
» 1196763 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 926 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 9926 m/e 01/1926
LNER (1946) 9163 m/e 06/1946
BR 69163 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L492
Works Number 19847
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal w/e Mon 12/02/1962 off Eastfield (65A)
Scrapping During 07/1962 at Campbells (Airdrie)
Service Life 49 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65D Dawsholm 4w/e 25/11/1950
65A Eastfield 4w/e 12/06/1954
65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 06/07/1957
65A Eastfield 8w/e 31/08/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 12/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 15/05/1954
ALLOC 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 07/09/1957
WDN   w/e 12/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1954 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as NBR Number 926
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19847
   
01/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9926    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9163    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69163    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
05/1954 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
12/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
12/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69163 from Eastfield (65A)    
07/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev