Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1030 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 1030 Week
» 7164 Month
» 235048 Year
» 1456613 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 925 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 9925 m/e 10/1925
LNER (1946) 9162 m/e 11/1946
BR 69162 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L492
Works Number 19846
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Mon 02/03/1959 off Polmont (64E)
Scrapping During 02/1960 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 46 yrs, 7 mths , -1 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1912
POL Polmont 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 02/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   02/03/1959
TOSTORE   4w/e 21/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
22/08/1948 Eastfleld MPD Class 'Q.1' NO,. 9927 has been re-numbered 69927 and lettered British Railways, but retains the L.N.E.R. totem on the bunker. Another engine of this Class, No. 9925, has been fitted with slip-coupling apparatus since early July and was used on the Cowlairs Bank during the Glasgow Fair Holiday. No. 61103 (THJ) was noted here painted black and fully lined on 28/8 being ex Cowlairs W/E 28/8; a smokebox numberplate had been fitted SLS/194810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 925
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19846
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9925    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9162    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL)    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69162    
02/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69162 from Polmont (64E)    

prev prev