Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 993 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 993 Week
» 7127 Month
» 235011 Year
» 1456576 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 923 m/e 08/1912
LNER (1924) 9923 m/e 04/1924
LNER (1946) 9160 m/e 06/1946
BR 69160 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N15
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L492
Works Number 19844
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 08/1912
Withdrawal Thu 14/08/1958 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 02/1960 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 46 yrs , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1912
DFU Dunfermline Upper 01/01/1948
65A Eastfield 4w/e 12/04/1958
   Withdrawn 14/08/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 19/04/1958
WDN   14/08/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1952 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/09/1947 Eastfield MPD Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. SLS/194711

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1912 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 923
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19844
   
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9923    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9160    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69160    
11/1952 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
14/08/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69160 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev prev